HI SCR9 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR9
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Referred to EDN, referral sheet 38
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Referred to EDN, referral sheet 38
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Education To Carry On Its Work To Better Engage Community Groups In The Education Of Children And Youth In Hawaii's Public Schools.
Title
Urging The Department Of Education To Carry On Its Work To Better Engage Community Groups In The Education Of Children And Youth In Hawaii's Public Schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to EDN, referral sheet 38 |
2017-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 397) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-17. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1269) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR9 (Carry Over) 2017-04-03 - Referred to EDN, referral sheet 38
HCR9 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HCR9 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).