HI SCR89 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-11 - Referred to CMV, JHA, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-11 - Referred to CMV, JHA, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health And Department Of Public Safety To Work In Collaboration To Preserve The Health And Safety Of Special Needs Inmates And Others In The State's Jails And Prisons.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health And Department Of Public Safety To Work In Collaboration To Preserve The Health And Safety Of Special Needs Inmates And Others In The State's Jails And Prisons.
Sponsors
Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Tim Richards [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-24 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to CMV, JHA, referral sheet 28 |
2023-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 595). |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-23. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported from PSM/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1578) with recommendation of adoption. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-23 2:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HHS. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR81 (Same As) 2023-03-15 - Referred to PSM.
Subjects
Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Department of Health
Department of Public Safety
Medical and Mental Health Disabilities and Disorders
Special Needs Inmates
Department of Health
Department of Public Safety
Medical and Mental Health Disabilities and Disorders
Special Needs Inmates