HI SCR88 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR88
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Army Corps Of Engineers, Department Of Land And Natural Resources, And Others, To Collaborate To Research And Develop A Plan For Increasing Water Circulation And Improving Water Quality In Pokai Bay On Leeward Oahu.
Title
Urging The United States Army Corps Of Engineers, Department Of Land And Natural Resources, And Others, To Collaborate To Research And Develop A Plan For Increasing Water Circulation And Improving Water Quality In Pokai Bay On Leeward Oahu.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6). |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1797), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-04-12 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Creagan, LoPresti, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, DeCoite, Thielen. |
2017-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 04-12-17 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 439) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1441) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1201), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Kim. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 2:46PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN/PSM, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR88 (Carry Over) 2017-04-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6).
HCR194 (Same As) 2017-04-07 - Referred to PSM/WTL/HRE.
HCR194 (Same As) 2017-04-07 - Referred to PSM/WTL/HRE.