HI SCR88 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR88
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Study The Cost Of Convening A Constitutional Convention.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Study The Cost Of Convening A Constitutional Convention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR88 (Carry Over) 2017-04-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6).
HCR39 (Same As) 2018-04-10 - Referred to JDC.
HCR39 (Same As) 2018-04-10 - Referred to JDC.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=88&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR88_.HTM |