HI SCR74 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR74
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Lahaina, Maui, For The Maintenance And Repair Of The Existing Concrete Seawall, And For The Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Title
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term, Non-exclusive Easement Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Lahaina, Maui, For The Maintenance And Repair Of The Existing Concrete Seawall, And For The Use, Repair, And Maintenance Of The Existing Improvements Constructed Thereon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2017-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-21 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Souki, Takumi, Tokioka excused (8). |
2017-04-21 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1812), recommending adoption. |
2017-04-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Quinlan. |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-20-17 10:45AM in conference room 308. |
2017-04-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6). |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported from OMH/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1801), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-04-13 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Ichiyama, Fukumoto. |
2017-04-13 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH/WAL on Thursday, 04-13-17 11:40AM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 434) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1392) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-17 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1194), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Kim. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 2:50PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR74 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HCR82 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HCR82 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
BLNR
Concrete Seawall
Issuance of a Term, Non-Exclusive Easement
State Submerged Lands at Lahaina, Maui
Concrete Seawall
Issuance of a Term, Non-Exclusive Easement
State Submerged Lands at Lahaina, Maui