HI SCR74 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Legislature To Convene A Working Group To Research, Discuss, And Make Recommendations Regarding Edible Medical Marijuana Products.
Title
Medical Marijuana; Working Group; Edibles
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3159), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-16 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |