HI SCR64 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR64
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adopted (Sen. Com. No. 847).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adopted (Sen. Com. No. 847).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Federal Funding To Provide School Resource Officers In Every Middle Or Intermediate School And High School In The State That Requests School Resource Officers.
Title
Requesting Federal Funding To Provide School Resource Officers In Every Middle Or Intermediate School And High School In The State That Requests School Resource Officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Adopted (Sen. Com. No. 847). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-27-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-27-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-24-18 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2018-04-24 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 829). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 639). |
2018-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-23 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ing, LoPresti voting no (2) and Representative(s) Evans, Hashem, Say excused (3). |
2018-04-23 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2070-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-04-17 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-19-18 11:00AM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2045-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-13 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ing, McKelvey, Quinlan. |
2018-04-12 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 04-13-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 510) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3488) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 4:00PM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from PSM/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3293), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, L. Thielen. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 03-27-18 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-22-18 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-18 2:46PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to PSM/EDU, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR64 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.