HI SCR63 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Honolulu Authority For Rapid Transportation To Identify And Implement Cost Cutting Practices.
Title
Honolulu Authority for Rapid Transportation; Budget; General Excise Tax Surcharge; Cost Cutting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from TRA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1212), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, English, Espero, Inouye, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Slom. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to TRA/PSM, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=63&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SCR63_.HTM |