HI SCR61 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor, Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism, Board Of Regents Of The University Of Hawaii, Board Of Education, And Hawaii's Congressional Delegation To Strengthen The Sister-state Relationship With Taiwan In Commemoration Of The Twentieth Anniversary Of The Sister-state Relationship Between Hawaii And Taiwan.
Title
Taiwan; Sister-State Relationship; Strengthening
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 386). |
2013-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-01 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey excused (1). |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1305), recommending adoption. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ohno, McDermott. |
2013-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-27-13 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-03-22 | House | Referred to VMI, referral sheet 43 |
2013-03-18 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 400) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-18-13. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 876) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Gabbard, Slom. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-13 1:16PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Referred to TIA. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Offered. |