HI SCR31 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR31
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 53
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 53
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Commission A Monument To President Barack Obama.
Title
Requesting The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Commission A Monument To President Barack Obama.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 499) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3476) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3284), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR31 (Carry Over) 2017-04-12 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.