HI SCR28 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Establishment Of A Prompt Payment Task Force To Examine And Resolve Issues That Prevent State Agencies From Making Prompt Payment For Goods And Services Purchased Through Nonprofit Organizations, Particularly Human Service Nonprofit Organizations, That Deliver Pivotal Goods And Services To Individuals, Families, And Communities.
Title
Prompt Payment Task Force; 2012 Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 677). | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Cabanilla, Carroll, M. Oshiro excused. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1746), recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Tokioka. | |
2011-04-21 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-21-11 1:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 61 | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 615) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1296) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-13 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: English, Espero, Kim, Tokuda. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-13-11 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1013), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Slom. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has rescheduled its public hearing to 03-16-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-11 | (S) The public hearing scheduled on 03-11-11 at 2:45PM in conference room 229 has been cancelled. | |
2011-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) Offered. |