HI SCR27 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Aerospace Development To Develop A Plan For The Gil Kahele Aero Technology Campus.
Title
Office of Aerospace Development; Gil Kahele Aero Technology Campus
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported from PSM/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2927), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, Espero, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Slom, Keith-Agaran, L. Thielen. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to PSM/EET, WAM. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=27&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SCR27_.HTM |