HI SCR243 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR243
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-18 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Engaging, Endorsing, Accepting, And Adopting The New York Declaration On Forests To Achieve The United Nations Paris Agreement And The 2030 Agenda For Sustainable Development, Specifically Sustainable Development Goal 15, Life On Land.
Title
Engaging, Endorsing, Accepting, And Adopting The New York Declaration On Forests To Achieve The United Nations Paris Agreement And The 2030 Agenda For Sustainable Development, Specifically Sustainable Development Goal 15, Life On Land.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JHA as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Woodson excused (2). |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2056-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-04-14 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, Tokioka. |
2022-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-14-22 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred to EEP, JHA, referral sheet 44 |
2022-04-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 584). |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-01-22. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3574) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to AEN. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR243 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Subjects
2030 Agenda for Sustainable Development
Climate Change
New York Declaration on Forests
Sustainable Development Goals
United Nations
Climate Change
New York Declaration on Forests
Sustainable Development Goals
United Nations