HI SCR243 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR243
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study And Develop Statutory Definitions Of "creative Work" And "creative Workers" By Taking Into Consideration Hawaii's Existing Creative Work Industry, As Groundwork For The Legislature To Adopt Measures To Support Hawaii's Creative Workers.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau To Conduct A Study And Develop Statutory Definitions Of "creative Work" And "creative Workers" By Taking Into Consideration Hawaii's Existing Creative Work Industry, As Groundwork For The Legislature To Adopt Measures To Support Hawaii's Creative Workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1773), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-04-07 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 04-07-21 10:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 592) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from LCA/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1492) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA/EET. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to GVO/EET. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR243 (Carry Over) 2021-04-08 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HCR182 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SR202 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR182 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SR202 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.