HI SCR214 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR214
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Re-referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 46
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Re-referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 46
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii To Establish A Reliable, Independent, And Transparent Methodology To Assess Effects Of Radio Frequency Emissions Generated By Wireless Antenna Sites.
Title
Requesting The University Of Hawaii To Establish A Reliable, Independent, And Transparent Methodology To Assess Effects Of Radio Frequency Emissions Generated By Wireless Antenna Sites.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Re-referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 46 |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to EEP, HET, referral sheet 45 |
2022-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from HRE/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3666) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HRE/EET. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR214 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to EET/PSM.
SR207 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
SR207 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.