HI SCR201 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Human Services To Create A Compact Of Free Association Advisory Body.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Human Services To Create A Compact Of Free Association Advisory Body.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2240) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-04-12HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2019-04-09HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 04-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 329.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 640).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1787) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1368), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:50PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to HMS, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HCR217 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback