HI SCR197 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR197
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs Create An Interim Working Group To Review Laws And Regulations Governing Time Share Plans.
Title
Requesting That The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs Create An Interim Working Group To Review Laws And Regulations Governing Time Share Plans.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR197 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
HCR95 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to TIA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR95 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to TIA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=197&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR197_.HTM |