HI SCR195 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education, State Public Charter School Commission, And Hawaii Public Charter Schools Network To Develop A Plan To Commission A New Study Suggesting Updates To The School Impact Fee Formula And Differentiating The Land Requirements For Greenfield Development And Redevelopment Of Urban Areas.
Title
Department of Education; School Impact Fees; Transit-Oriented Development; State Public Charter School Commission; Hawaii Public Charter Schools Network
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from EDU/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1263), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Ihara, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Slom. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-15 1:25PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to EDU/WTL, WAM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |