HI SCR194 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to HUS, EDN, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to HUS, EDN, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The State And The City And County Of Honolulu To Seriously Consider The Establishment Of An Accessible Public Playground That Allows Visually Impaired Children To Freely Explore Their Environment And Interact With Their Families And Friends In A Safe, Welcoming, And Developmentally Enriching Environment.
Title
Americans with Disabilities Act; Visually Impaired Children; Playground
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to HUS, EDN, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 684) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1478) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from PSM/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1210), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Taniguchi. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HMS, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=194&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR194_.HTM |