HI SCR193 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 53
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 53
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Office Of Homeland Security And Office Of Planning To Form A Critical Infrastructure And Resiliency Council, With Consultation From The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism.
Title
Urging The Office Of Homeland Security And Office Of Planning To Form A Critical Infrastructure And Resiliency Council, With Consultation From The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 554) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3389) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 04-02-18 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to GVO/PSM, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Subjects
Critical Infrastructure and Resiliency Council
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Office of Homeland Security
Office of Planning
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Office of Homeland Security
Office of Planning