HI SCR184 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Insurance Commissioner To Study The Adequacy Of Insurance Coverage Requirements For Transportation Network Companies And Transportation Network Company Drivers.
Title
Requesting The Insurance Commissioner To Study The Adequacy Of Insurance Coverage Requirements For Transportation Network Companies And Transportation Network Company Drivers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-12-18 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 549) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from CPH/TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3443) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Nishihara. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-18 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to CPH/TRE. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR171 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Coverage Requirements
Study
Transportation Network Companies
Transportation Network Company Drivers
Insurance Coverage Requirements
Study
Transportation Network Companies
Transportation Network Company Drivers