HI SCR176 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR176
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor To Negotiate Land Exchanges For The Purpose Of Acquiring Private Lands Suitable For Long-term Diversified Agriculture Production In Exchange For State Lands To Be Acquired For Affordable, Workforce, And Other Housing For Hawaii Residents.
Title
Requesting The Governor To Negotiate Land Exchanges For The Purpose Of Acquiring Private Lands Suitable For Long-term Diversified Agriculture Production In Exchange For State Lands To Be Acquired For Affordable, Workforce, And Other Housing For Hawaii Residents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN/HOU, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR176 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
HCR127 (Same As) 2017-03-14 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 30
HCR127 (Same As) 2017-03-14 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 30
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=176&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SCR176_.HTM |