HI SCR176 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR176
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Transportation To Assess The Dangers Of Pedestrian Use Of The Shoulder Of Haleakala Highway Between Upper Kimo Drive And Ainakula Road And To Examine Potential Pedestrian Safety Countermeasures.
Title
Urging The Department Of Transportation To Assess The Dangers Of Pedestrian Use Of The Shoulder Of Haleakala Highway Between Upper Kimo Drive And Ainakula Road And To Examine Potential Pedestrian Safety Countermeasures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2012-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-13 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, McDermott. |
2018-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 04-13-18 10:00AM in conference room 423. |
2018-04-04 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 52 |
2018-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 476). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-18. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Reported from TRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3359) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-18 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Referred to TRE/PSM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR176 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
HCR112 (Same As) 2018-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR112 (Same As) 2018-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=176&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR176_.HTM |