HI SCR172 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Collaborate With Universities In The State To Convene The Hawaii Creative Innovation Group.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Collaborate With Universities In The State To Convene The Hawaii Creative Innovation Group.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7). |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1860-24), recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-04-11 | House | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Kong, La Chica, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Nakamura. |
2024-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by ECD on Thursday, 04-11-24 11:30AM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 445) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3566) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to EET. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR184 (Same As) 2024-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SR148 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
SR148 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Subjects
Creative
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Film
Hawaii Creative Innovation Group
Industry
Media
Report
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Film
Hawaii Creative Innovation Group
Industry
Media
Report