HI SCR171 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Acknowledging The Positive Impact Of The Taro Security And Purity Task Force And Supporting The Reformation Of The Task Force As A Legislatively Enabled Body, Should The Taro Farming Community Determine The Need To Do So.
Title
Taro Security and Purity Task Force; Taro Protection
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HWN/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1201), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, L. Thielen, Wakai. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Inouye, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-15 1:40PM in conference room 224. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to HWN/AGL, WAM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |