HI SCR17 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR17
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Perform An Actuarial Study On The Size Of The Current And Projected Future Populations Of Hawaiians Eligible To Lease Hawaiian Home Lands.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Perform An Actuarial Study On The Size Of The Current And Projected Future Populations Of Hawaiians Eligible To Lease Hawaiian Home Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on HWN deferred the measure. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:16PM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-12-19 2:40PM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 2:40PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR17 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
HCR153 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR153 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=17&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR17_.HTM |