HI SCR162 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR162
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Office Of Planning, In Coordination With Each Executive Department, Identify Departmental Facilities And Infrastructure That May Be Vulnerable To Flooding And Other Impacts Of Sea Level Rise And Assess Options For Mitigating The Effects Of Sea Level Rise On Those Facilities And Infrastructure.
Title
Requesting That The Office Of Planning, In Coordination With Each Executive Department, Identify Departmental Facilities And Infrastructure That May Be Vulnerable To Flooding And Other Impacts Of Sea Level Rise And Assess Options For Mitigating The Effects Of Sea Level Rise On Those Facilities And Infrastructure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 549) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from GVO/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1397) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chang, Fevella. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-21 3:15PM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to GVO/WTL. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR162 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 32
SR127 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR127 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.