HI SCR155 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marumoto, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marumoto, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Kahoolawe Island Reserve Commission To Require Each Stewardship Program Conducting Activities On The Kahoolawe Island Reserve To Obtain Liability And Property Damage Insurance And List The State As An Additional Insured.
Title
Kahoolawe Island Reserve Commission; Liability and Property Damage Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marumoto, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1800-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Belatti, Jordan, Morikawa, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Yamane, Pine. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 04-20-12 3:25PM in conference room 329. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HAW on Friday, 04-20-12 10:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Referred to HAW, FIN, referral sheet 66 | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 736) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3426) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-04-11 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-11-12 9:35AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3125), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ryan, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Shimabukuro ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Fukunaga, Slom. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-12 1:20PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to WLH, WAM. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) Offered. |