HI SCR153 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN, CPC, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Convening Of A Working Group To Discuss The Role Of The Authorizer, Its Relationship With Charter Schools, The Accountability For The Use Of Public Funds, And Whether Or Not Legislation Is Required To Effectuate Any Desired Changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Convening Of A Working Group To Discuss The Role Of The Authorizer, Its Relationship With Charter Schools, The Accountability For The Use Of Public Funds, And Whether Or Not Legislation Is Required To Effectuate Any Desired Changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HouseReferred to EDN, CPC, referral sheet 32
2021-03-31HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 542) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-31SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-30SenateOne Day Notice 03-31-21.
2021-03-30SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1315) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2021-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 3:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
2021-03-16SenateReferred to EDU.
2021-03-12SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback