HI SCR141 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Defer Lease Payments On Pasture Leases For Two Years To Afford Leaseholders A Reprieve From Drought Conditions.
Title
Pasture Leases; DLNR; Drought
Sponsors
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee on AGL deferred the measure. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-14 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AGL, WAM. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=141&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/SCR141_.HTM |