HI SCR140 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Task Force To Research And Develop A Green Highway Program In The State.
Title
Requesting The Convening Of A Task Force To Research And Develop A Green Highway Program In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7). |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1870-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-04-11 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 04-11-24 9:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 425) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from TCA/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3598) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, Awa. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to TCA/AEN. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR121 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24