HI SCR134 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR134
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to LAB/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to LAB/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations, In Collaboration With The Department Of Agriculture, And Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism, To Submit A Report Determining A Living Wage Standard For Agricultural Workers Living In The State.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations, In Collaboration With The Department Of Agriculture, And Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism, To Submit A Report Determining A Living Wage Standard For Agricultural Workers Living In The State.
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to LAB/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 625) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from LCA/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1755) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 2:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to LCA/AEN. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR134 (Carry Over) 2019-04-05 - Referred to LAB/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 50
HCR54 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LAB/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR54 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to LAB/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 33