HI SCR134 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR134
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Establish A Free Application For Federal Student Aid Working Group To Develop And Implement A Plan To Make Completion Of A Free Application For Federal Student Aid A Statewide Graduation Requirement Beginning In The 2022-2023 Academic Year.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Establish A Free Application For Federal Student Aid Working Group To Develop And Implement A Plan To Make Completion Of A Free Application For Federal Student Aid A Statewide Graduation Requirement Beginning In The 2022-2023 Academic Year.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR134 (Carry Over) 2019-04-05 - Referred to LAB/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 50
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=134&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SCR134_.HTM |