HI SCR128 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ito, Rhoads excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ito, Rhoads excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Paroling Authority To Form A Working Group To Examine Smarter Sentencing To Improve The Quality And Reliability Of State Criminal Sentencing Practices.
Title
Judiciary; Smarter Sentencing Working Group; Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ito, Rhoads excused (3). |
2015-04-20 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1664) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-04-16 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee. |
2015-04-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 04-16-15 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 49 |
2015-04-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 461) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1376) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-06-15 9:29AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1218), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |