HI SCR102 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR102
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Perpetual, Non-exclusive Easement Covering Portions Of State Submerged Lands At Maunalua, Oahu, Hawaii, For The Construction And Maintenance Of A Rock Groin To Slow The Rate Of Sediment Deposition Into The Entrance Channel Of The Hawaii Kai Marina.
Title
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Perpetual, Non-exclusive Easement Covering Portions Of State Submerged Lands At Maunalua, Oahu, Hawaii, For The Construction And Maintenance Of A Rock Groin To Slow The Rate Of Sediment Deposition Into The Entrance Channel Of The Hawaii Kai Marina.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Adoption (Sen. Com. No. 861). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of reconsideration (Sen. Com. No. 861). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-20-21 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2021-04-21 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 846). |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 599). |
2021-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-19 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Perruso excused (2). |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1918), recommending adoption. |
2021-04-15 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno. |
2021-04-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-15-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-08 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1782) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2021-04-06 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 04-06-21 8:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 522) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. Noes, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1513) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-21 9:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1079), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 1:45PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR102 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HCR103 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 04-15-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
SR79 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
HCR103 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 04-15-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
SR79 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.