HI SCR100 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR100
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to HLT/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to HLT/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Law Enforcement Agencies To Follow The Guidelines Developed By The Malama Kakou Project For The Testing Of Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits And Requesting An Annual Report From The Department Of The Attorney General On The Testing Of Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits In The State.
Title
Urging Law Enforcement Agencies To Follow The Guidelines Developed By The Malama Kakou Project For The Testing Of Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits And Requesting An Annual Report From The Department Of The Attorney General On The Testing Of Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kits In The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to HLT/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 444) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1422) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1236), with recommendation of referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR100 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to HLT/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41
HCR133 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR133 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.