HI SB999 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB999
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - The committee(s) on PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-17 1:15PM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - The committee(s) on PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-17 1:15PM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that funds for discharged persons be subject to legislative appropriation. Clarifies circumstances under which the Hawaii Paroling Authority may grant early discharges.
Title
Relating To Parole.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-17 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB999 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - The committee(s) on PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-17 1:15PM in conference room 229.
HB1133 (Same As) 2017-01-31 - This measure has been deleted from hearing notice.
HB1133 (Same As) 2017-01-31 - This measure has been deleted from hearing notice.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=999&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB999_.HTM |