HI HB1133 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - This measure has been deleted from hearing notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that funds for discharged persons be subject to legislative appropriation. Clarifies circumstances under which the Hawaii Paroling Authority may grant early discharges. Provides the paroling authority with discretion when considering pardons for paroled prisoners and clarifies early discharge consideration of paroled prisoners is an administrative action, not an in-person hearing before the authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Parole.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-31HouseThis measure has been deleted from hearing notice.
2017-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-02-17 11:00AM in House conference room 312.
2017-01-27HouseReferred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2017-01-25HousePass First Reading
2017-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB999 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - The committee(s) on PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-17 1:15PM in conference room 229.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback