HI SB983 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB983
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the registration and registration renewal for methadone clinics and substance use disorder services clinics to be deemed a clinic and for the handling of controlled substances to be contingent upon its location being at least 750 feet away from a school. Gives methadone clinics and substance use disorder services clinics one year from the effective date of this Act to comply with this Act.
Title
Relating To Controlled Substances.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HHS, CPN. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB378 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
SB983 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to HHS, CPN.
SB983 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to HHS, CPN.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=983&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB983_.HTM |