HI SB981 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to continue administration of the Hawaii home visiting program, a hospital-based early identification designed to enhance health and safety outcomes and prevent child abuse and neglect, and ensure continuation of home visiting services in certain priority high-risk neighborhoods.
Title
Hawaii Home Visiting Program; Infants; Healthcare; Families; Children; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported from HSH/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 72) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Gabbard, Slom. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HSH/HTH, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=981&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB981_.HTM |