HI SB980 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the R.E.A.C.H. (Resources for Enrichment, Athletics, Culture, and Health) program in the Office of Youth Services to provide a standardized framework and funding for afterschool programs in public middle schools. Establishes a R.E.A.C.H. program special fund. (SB980 HD2)
Title
Afterschool Programs; Resources for Enrichment, Athletics, Culture, and Health Program; R.E.A.C.H.; Special Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1200) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-25 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Ito, LoPresti, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Kong, Say. |
2015-03-23 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-25-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Oshiro, Saiki, Say, Souki, Tokioka, Woodson excused (8). |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 928) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2015-03-17 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Oshiro. |
2015-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-17-15 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HUS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 248) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 794) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 22) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 1:45PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HSH, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB397 (Same As) 2015-02-20 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).