HI SB965 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB965
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the state tax credit for research activities to an unspecified portion of the allowable federal tax credit. Requires businesses to remain in Hawaii for 5 years after receiving the tax credit. Amends qualifying tax years. (SB965 HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1606) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-19 11:30AM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-19 11:30am. |
2019-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-15-19 11:30AM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-19 11:30am. |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 306) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 746) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Moriwaki, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB965 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
HB339 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Referred to WAM.
HB339 (Same As) 2019-03-05 - Referred to WAM.