HI SB955 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB955
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires financial disclosure statements of state agency executive directors to be public records available for inspection and duplication.
Title
Relating To Public Financial Disclosure Statement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1470), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. |
2019-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-15-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-19 at 2:00pm. |
2019-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 305). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 807) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 121) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 01-31-19 2:55PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB955 (Carry Over) 2019-03-20 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
Subjects
Disclosure of Financial Interest
Financial Disclosure Statements
Public Record
State Agency Executive Directors
Financial Disclosure Statements
Public Record
State Agency Executive Directors
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=955&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB955_.HTM |