HI SB952 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB952
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that if an application for pardon is not referred to the Director of Public Safety and the Hawaii Paroling Authority by the Governor, then the Governor shall provide public notice and a waiting period of fourteen days shall apply to the granting or refusing of the application for pardon. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Pardons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-28-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to PSM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from TEC/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 587) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to PSM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Wakai. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TEC/GVO, PSM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB952 (Carry Over) 2019-02-28 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.