HI SB922 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HMS, JDL.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HMS, JDL.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates instead of permits a family court to terminate the parental rights to any child of a natural parent if the natural parent is convicted of rape or sexual assault and that rape or sexual assault resulted in the conception of the child.
Title
Parental Rights; Rape; Sexual Assault
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, JDL. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 449) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Harimoto, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HSH, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1248 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=922&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB922_.HTM |