HI SB916 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that the $1,000,000 of transient accommodations tax revenues currently allocated to operate a Hawaiian center and the museum of Hawaiian music and dance may also be used to plan, design, and construct these facilities at an unspecified location. Identifies Waikiki as the future location for the Hawaiian center and museum of Hawaiian music and dance. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-10SenateReported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 91) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 3:00PM in conference room 224.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to EET, WAM.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1165 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback