HI HB1165 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1165
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the $1,000,000 of transient accommodations tax revenues currently allocated to operate a Hawaiian center and the museum of Hawaiian music and dance may also be used to plan, design, and construct these facilities at an unspecified location.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] |
Rep. Greggor Ilagan [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1165 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB916 (Same As) 2021-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB916 (Same As) 2021-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1165&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB1165_.HTM |