HI SB914 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB914

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Hawaii Public Housing Authority to conduct a study on the state of broadband access in all public housing projects in the State. Requires the Public Housing Authority to submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the legislature prior to the convening of the regular session of 2022. Authorizes the Hawaii Public Housing Authority to request assistance from the Legislative Reference Bureau as may be necessary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Broadband Access.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-03SenateRe-Referred to HMS/GVO, WAM/JDC.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to HMS/GVO, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB616 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB914 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to HMS/GVO, WAM/JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback