HI SB900 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Act 047, 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Act 047, 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "community-based organization." Amends the qualifications for community-based economic development grants to include technical assistance to community-based organizations. Reduces the number of Community-Based Economic Development Advisory Council members from twelve to ten. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Community-based Economic Development Technical And Financial Assistance Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Act 047, 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147). |
2017-06-22 | House | Act 047, on 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 107) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 107). |
2017-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Galuteria, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 1:35PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 1:35PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Galuteria, Nishihara Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2017-04-07 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 478). |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1668), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola. |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-31-17 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-30 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-17. |
2017-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3). |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1208) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-17 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-17-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 290) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 784) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-17 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 401) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1034 (Same As) 2017-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).