HI SB90 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB90
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for operating expenses of the Department of Education. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:15PM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:30PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 42) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1116) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 125) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB90 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.